Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 11/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 12/11/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/08/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 01/14/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/14/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/10/2014