Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 12/19/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/06/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 01/08/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 01/15/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/12/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/12/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/25/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 02/27/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/05/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/12/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/24/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/01/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/08/2014