Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/06/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/06/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/06/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/06/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/06/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/06/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/06/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/06/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/06/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/06/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/06/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 01/06/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 01/06/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/06/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/06/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/06/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/06/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/06/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/06/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/07/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 01/07/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/07/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/07/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/07/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 01/09/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/13/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/13/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 01/14/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 02/06/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/12/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/27/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/04/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/11/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/12/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/13/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/27/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/01/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/01/2014