Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 11/20/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 12/09/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/12/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 12/17/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/17/2013
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/08/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/10/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/10/2014