Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 11/19/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 11/19/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/20/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/21/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/21/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/14/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/16/2014