Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 11/14/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/11/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/11/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/11/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/13/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/13/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/06/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/27/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/12/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/06/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/12/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/13/2014