Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 11/13/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/09/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 12/11/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/17/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/01/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/11/2014