Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/06/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/11/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/25/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/11/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/24/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/08/2014