Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 11/04/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 11/07/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/07/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/12/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 11/14/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 11/19/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/18/2013