Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 10/30/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 10/31/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/04/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/14/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/12/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/18/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 12/19/2013