Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/29/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/29/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/29/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/29/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 10/29/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/29/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/29/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/29/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/29/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/30/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/30/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 10/31/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/06/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/12/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/08/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/09/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/14/2014