Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 10/28/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/27/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/30/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/06/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/06/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/26/2014