Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 09/25/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 09/25/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 09/25/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 09/25/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/27/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/30/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/30/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/30/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/02/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/08/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/15/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/29/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/05/2013