Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 09/24/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/25/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/25/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/25/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/26/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/26/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/27/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/27/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/30/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/30/2013