Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/30/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 01/30/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 01/30/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/06/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/25/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/30/2013