Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/17/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/17/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/19/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/24/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/01/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/04/2013