Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/17/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/17/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/17/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/17/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/17/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/19/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/19/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/23/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/23/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/24/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/24/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/30/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/01/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/01/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/04/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/09/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/30/2013