Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 09/12/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/17/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/18/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/19/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/23/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/16/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 11/20/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/09/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/17/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 12/18/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/25/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 04/10/2014