Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/10/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/10/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/12/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/12/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/12/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/12/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/12/2013
Sen. Chiesa, Jeff [R-NJ] 09/12/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/12/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 09/12/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/12/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/12/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/12/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/12/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 09/12/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/12/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/17/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/17/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/17/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/17/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/17/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/17/2013
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/17/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/24/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/26/2013