Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/07/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/27/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/12/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 04/08/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/17/2013