Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/09/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/10/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/11/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/28/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/30/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/04/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/13/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/13/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/09/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 12/09/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/09/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/09/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/16/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/16/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/17/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/19/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/15/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/28/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 02/03/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/06/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/10/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/06/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/10/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/12/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/12/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/12/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/12/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/12/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/12/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/12/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/12/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/12/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/12/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/12/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/12/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/12/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/12/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/12/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/12/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/12/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/12/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/12/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/12/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/12/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/12/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/12/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/12/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/12/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/12/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/12/2014