Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 09/09/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/09/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/09/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/09/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/10/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/10/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/17/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/17/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/17/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/14/2013