Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/18/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/18/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/18/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/12/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 11/20/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/10/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/07/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/09/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 01/15/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 01/16/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/30/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/06/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/06/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 02/24/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/26/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/06/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/12/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/24/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/31/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/08/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/10/2014