Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/23/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/07/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 11/21/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/10/2014