Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/23/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/24/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/28/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/28/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/28/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/28/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/28/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/28/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/28/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/28/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 10/28/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/28/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/28/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/28/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 10/28/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/09/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/12/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/12/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/16/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/16/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/16/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/20/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/20/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/20/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 01/09/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/13/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 01/14/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/27/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 01/28/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/04/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/24/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/25/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/25/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/26/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/13/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/13/2014