Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/11/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/11/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/26/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/10/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/31/2014