Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/25/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 11/13/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/17/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/12/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/25/2014