Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/25/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/28/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/30/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 11/12/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/17/2013