Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/29/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/06/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/15/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/12/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/10/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/27/2014