Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 07/23/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/24/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 07/25/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 08/01/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/27/2014