Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/23/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/23/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/23/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/31/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/01/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/01/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 09/23/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/03/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/07/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/27/2014