Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/25/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/25/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/31/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/31/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/31/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/17/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 09/18/2013