Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/31/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/17/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/18/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/26/2014