Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/23/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/29/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 08/01/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 08/01/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/09/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/11/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/30/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/28/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/07/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 11/12/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/14/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/18/2013