Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/08/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/08/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/29/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/30/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/04/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/14/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/06/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/11/2014