Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/17/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/17/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/17/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/17/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/18/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/24/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/31/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/09/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/17/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/06/2013