Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/24/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/10/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/27/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/30/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/14/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 11/18/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 01/09/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/24/2014