Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 07/16/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/18/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/23/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/31/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 08/01/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/09/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/09/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/11/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/17/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/17/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/18/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/19/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/19/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/19/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/23/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/23/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/25/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/25/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/25/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/26/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/27/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/11/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/11/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/16/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/28/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/28/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 10/28/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/29/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/30/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 10/30/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/31/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/31/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/31/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 11/04/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/04/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/06/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/14/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/18/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/20/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/09/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/09/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/09/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 12/11/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/18/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/18/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 12/19/2013