Refine your search

Date Chamber Actions
09/18/2013  Became Public Law No: 113-32.
09/18/2013  Signed by President.
09/12/2013 SenatePresented to President.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/10/2013-2:25pm HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 1 (Roll no. 452). (text: CR H5450-5451)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-2:18pm HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5456-5457)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-1:02pm HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-1:00pm HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 130.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-1:00pm HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5450-5451)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-1:00pm HouseMr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013 HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 137.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013 HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-190.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 HouseSubcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/19/2013 HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
06/21/2013 HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
06/20/2013 HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2013 SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
06/20/2013-2:00pm HouseReceived in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/19/2013 SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4719)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
04/22/2013 SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 49.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
04/22/2013 SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-18.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources
03/14/2013 SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources
01/24/2013 SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
01/24/2013 SenateIntroduced in Senate
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate