Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/09/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/23/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/31/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/31/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/10/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/21/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/04/2014