Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/16/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 09/17/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/18/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/30/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/24/2014