Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/08/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/08/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/09/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/10/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/10/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/10/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/16/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/16/2013