Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/26/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/24/2013
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 01/16/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/03/2014