Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 06/24/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 06/24/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/24/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/24/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/24/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/25/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/08/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 07/24/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/30/2013