Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/25/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/26/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/27/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/27/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/08/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/08/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/15/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/29/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/30/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/29/2013