Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/24/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/24/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/24/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/25/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/10/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 10/09/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/28/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/30/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/19/2013