Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/12/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/12/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/12/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/08/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/16/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/09/2013