Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/20/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/25/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/26/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/16/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/01/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/19/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/11/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/06/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/13/2014