Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/06/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/06/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/10/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/10/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/10/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/11/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/26/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 12/10/2013