Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/17/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/11/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/31/2013
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/26/2014